No. 18-1233
Title:Romag Fasteners, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Fossil, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2417)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Romag Fasteners, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2019.
May 22 2019Brief of respondents Fossil, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioner Romag Fasteners, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 13, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 26, 2019.
Aug 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Romag Fasteners, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Fossil, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Romag Fasteners, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Evan Dupler
    Counsel of Record
Gibney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP
665 5th Avenue
New York, NY 10022

jdupler@gibney.com
212-688-5151
Party name: Fossil, Inc., et al.