No. 18-1230
Title:Juan Zamudio, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 21, 2019
Linked with 18A821
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1529)
   Decision Date:November 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2019Application (18A821) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 18, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Application (18A821) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 21, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2019.
May 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2019 to June 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 21, 2019.
Jun 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2019 to July 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 8, 2019.
Jul 08 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Strauss
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1111 E. 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60637

d-strauss@uchicago.edu
(773) 834-3190
Party name: Juan Zamudio
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States