No. 18-1224
Title:NuStar Energy Services, Inc., Petitioner
v.
ING Bank N.V., et al.
Docketed:March 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1458)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2018
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Waiver of right of respondent Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 05 2019Waiver of right of respondent Nippon Kaisha Line Limited to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 09 2019Waiver of right of respondent ING Bank N.V. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019Waiver of right of respondent O.W. Bunker USA, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 24 2019Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2019)
May 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2019 to June 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 24, 2019, for all respondents.
May 30 2019Letter of May 21, 2019 from counsel for respondent Clearlake Shipping Pte. Ltd, received.
Jun 05 2019Letter of May 29, 2019 from counsel for respondent Nippon Kaisha Line Limited received.
Jun 24 2019Brief of respondents ING Bank N.V. and O.W. Bunker USA Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 09 2019Reply of petitioner NuStar Energy Services, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US, LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: NuStar Energy Services, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Eugene O'Connor
    Counsel of Record
Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
437 Madison Ave.
New York, NY 10022

roconnor@mmwr.com
2128679500
Party name: O.W. Bunker USA, Inc.
Bruce G. Paulsen
    Counsel of Record
Seward & Kissel, LLP
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

Paulsen@sewkis.com
212-574-1448
Party name: ING Bank N.V.
James H. HohensteinHolland & Knights, LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

james.hohenstein@hklaw.com
212-513-3200
Party name: Clearlake Shipping Pte Ltd.
James H. PowerHolland & Knight, LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

james.power@hklaw.com
212-513-3200
Party name: Nippon Kaisha Line Limited