No. 18-122 | |
Title: | Michael Sinegal, Petitioner v. Dawn Polk |
Docketed: | July 27, 2018 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-41521) |
Decision Date: | March 14, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 30, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 24 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 12 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018. |
Sep 14 2018 | Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2018) |
Sep 29 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2018 to November 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 03 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2018. |
Nov 14 2018 | Brief of respondent Dawn Polk in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 28 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. |
Nov 28 2018 | Reply of petitioner Michael Sinegal filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Kathleen Marie Kennedy Counsel of Record | Jefferson County District Attorney's Office 1085 Pearl Street, 3rd Floor Beaumont, TX 77701 kkennedy@co.jefferson.tx.us | 409-835-8577 |
Party name: Michael Sinegal | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Laurence W. Watts | Watts & Company Lawyers, Ltd. P.O. Box 2214 Missouri City, TX 77459 wattstrial@gmail.com | (281) 431-1500 |
Party name: Dawn Polk |