No. 18-1219
Title:Illinois, Petitioner
v.
Derrick Bonilla
Docketed:March 20, 2019
Linked with 18A722
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Illinois
   Case Numbers:(122484)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2019Application (18A722) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 16, 2019 to March 17, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 14 2019Application (18A722) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 17, 2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2019 to June 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 18, 2019.
Apr 19 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Marc Glick
    Counsel of Record
Illinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

mglick@atg.state.il.us
3128142232
Party name: Illinois
Attorneys for Respondent
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Derrick Bonilla
Other
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah