No. 18-1218
Title:Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, Litigation Trustee to the Greektown Litigation Trust, Petitioner
v.
Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chippewa Indians, et al.
Docketed:March 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1165, 18-1166)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2019 to May 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2019.
May 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2019 to June 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 19, 2019.
Jun 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2019 to July 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 19, 2019.
Jul 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 19, 2018 to August 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 19, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7902
Party name: Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, Litigation Trustee to the Greektown Litigation Trust
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew C. Blickensderfer
    Counsel of Record
Frost Brown Todd LLC
3300 Great American Tower
301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202

mblickensderfer@fbtlaw.com
(513) 651-6162
Party name: Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chippewa Indians, et al.