No. 18-1211
Title:NuStar Energy Services, Inc., Petitioner
v.
ING Bank N.V., et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20246)
   Decision Date:January 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Waiver of right of respondents Cosco Haifa Maritime Ltd., Cosco Auckland Maritime Ltd., Coscon and Cosco Venice Maritime Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 09 2019Waiver of right of respondent ING Bank N.V. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 25 2019Response Requested. (Due May 28, 2019)
May 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 28, 2019 to June 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 24, 2019, for all respondents.
Jun 24 2019Brief of respondent ING Bank N.V. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jun 24 2019Brief of respondents Cosco Haifa Maritime Ltd., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jul 09 2019Reply of petitioner NuStar Energy Services, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US, LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: NuStar Energy Services, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Bruce Gordon Paulsen
    Counsel of Record
Seward & Kissel LLP
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

paulsen@sewkis.com
212-574-1200
Party name: ING Bank N.V.
Gina Maria Venezia
    Counsel of Record
Freehill Hogan & Mahar, LLP
80 Pine Street, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10005

venezia@freehill.com
212-425-1900
Party name: Cosco Haifa Maritime Ltd., Cosco Auckland Maritime Ltd., Coscon and Cosco Venice Maritime Ltd.
Bruce G. PaulsenSeward & Kissel, LLP
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

Paulsen@sewkis.com
212-574-1448
Party name: ING Bank N.V.
James L. RossFreehill Hogan & Maher, LLP
80 Pine Street
New York, NY 10005-1759

ross@freehill.com
212-425-1900
Party name: Cosco Haifa Maritime Ltd., Cosco Auckland Maritime Ltd., Coscon and Cosco Venice Maritime Ltd.