No. 18-12
Title:Joseph A. Kennedy, Petitioner
v.
Bremerton School District
Docketed:July 2, 2018
Linked with 17A1086
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35801)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2018Application (17A1086) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 25, 2018 to May 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Application (17A1086) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 25, 2018.
May 10 2018Application (17A1086) to extend further the time from May 25, 2018 to June 24, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 15 2018Application (17A1086) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 24, 2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph A. Kennedy.
Blanket Consent
Jul 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2018 to August 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2018.
Aug 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Texas High School Coaches Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Robert Cleckler Bowden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Brief of respondent Bremerton School District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 05 2018Reply of petitioner Joseph A. Kennedy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2018Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Joseph A. Kennedy
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Tierney
    Counsel of Record
Tierney & Correa
719 Second Ave
701 Millennium Tower
Seattle, WA 98104

tierney@tierneylaw.com
2062323074
Party name: Bremerton School District
Other
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 West Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Kevin William Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3900
Dallas, TX 75201

kbrooks@velaw.com
214-220-7805
Party name: Members of Congress
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Rusty Duane Crandell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rusty.Crandell@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: Arizona, et al.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-324-1812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Adam Michael Foslid
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 4400
Miami, FL 33131

foslida@gtlaw.com
(305) 579-0500
Party name: Robert Cleckler Bowden
Sean Daniel Jordan
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
100 Congress Avenue
Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701

sjordan@jw.com
512-236-2281
Party name: The Texas High School Coaches Association