No. 18-1199
Title:InvestPic, LLC, Petitioner
v.
SAP America, Inc.
Docketed:March 14, 2019
Linked with 18A586
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2081)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2018Application (18A586) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2019 to March 8, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Application (18A586) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 8, 2019.
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, InvestPic, LLC.
Blanket Consent
Apr 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, SAP America, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Apr 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2019.
Apr 15 2019Amicus brief of Anne E. Barschall not accepted for filing. (April 16, 2019) (Corrected electronic filing submitted)
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Sam Savage filed. (4/18/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Mario Villena, Jose Villena filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2019Amicus brief of Amplify Exchange and Mighty Buildings not accepted for filing. (April 17, 2019 -- Corrected version submitted)
Apr 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Amplify Exchange and Mighty Buildings filed. (4/16/2019)
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Sam Savage not accepted for filing.(April 17, 2019)(Corrected version to be submitted)
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Anne E. Barschall filed. (04/16/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Amicus brief of Dr. Philip Neches not accepted for filing. (April 17, 2019) (Corrected version to be submitted)
Apr 15 2019Brief amici curiae of US Inventor, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Philip Neches filed. (4/18/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Amplify Exchange, LLC and Mighty Buildings, Inc. filed. (4/29/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2019Brief of respondent SAP America, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Reply of petitioner InvestPic, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Frederick Abrams
    Counsel of Record
Foster Pepper PLLC
1111 Third Avenue
Suite 3000
Seattle, WA 98101

bill.abrams@foster.com
206-447-6274
Party name: InvestPic, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@winston.com
(202) 282-5879
Party name: SAP America, Inc.
Other
Anne E. Barschall
    Counsel of Record
of counsel to Falati
80 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591

anne.barschall@gmail.com
914-332-1019
Party name: Anne E. Barschall
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: Dr. Sam Savage
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: Dr. Philip Neches
Burman York Mathis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law offices of Burman Y Mathis
471 Riverside Drive
Harper's Ferry, WV 25425

budmathis@yahoo.com
703 901 1683
Party name: Amplify Exchange and Mighty Buildings
Burman York Mathis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Burman Y. Mathis
471 Riverside Drive
Harper's Ferry, WV 20191

budmathis@yahoo.com
703 901 1683
Party name: Mario Villena, Jose Villena
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Steven William Smyrski
    Counsel of Record
Smyrski Law Group, A P.C.
3310 Airport Avenue, SW
Santa Monica, CA 90405

steve@smyrski.com
3103979118
Party name: US Inventor, et al.