No. 18-1193 | |
Title: | Brandon Lee Moon, Petitioner v. County of El Paso, Texas, et al. |
Docketed: | March 14, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-50572) |
Decision Date: | October 15, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 12, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 12 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 19 2019 | Letter pursuant to Rule 12.6 from counsel for the petitioner received. |
Main Document | |
Apr 05 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent City of El Paso, Texas to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 11 2019 | Brief of County of El Paso, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (April 12, 2019) (Corrected electronic filing submitted) |
Apr 11 2019 | Brief of respondents County of El Paso, et al. in opposition filed. (4/15/2019) |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 30 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. |
May 07 2019 | Reply of petitioner BrandonLee Moon filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 20 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jane Marie Noemie Webre Counsel of Record | Scott, Douglass & McConnico 303 Colorado Street Suite 2400 Austin, TX 78701 jwebre@scottdoug.com | 5124956300 |
Party name: BrandonLee Moon | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Cygne Lynn Nemir Counsel of Record | Attorney at Law 1221 E. Baltimore Dr. El Paso, TX 79902 cygnenemir@aol.com | 915-345-7777 |
Party name: County of El Paso, et al. | ||
Osar G. Gabaldon Jr. | Office of the El Paso City Attorney P.O. Box 1890 El Paso, TX 79950 | 915-212-0033 |
Party name: City of El Paso, Texas |