No. 18-1173
Title:I. B. and Jane Doe, Petitioners
v.
April Woodard, et al.
Docketed:March 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1066)
   Decision Date:January 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, I.B. and Jane Doe.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, April Woodard, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Justice Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amici curiae of Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amici curiae of Home School Legal Defense Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Scholars of the Law of Qualified Immunity filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief of respondents April Woodard, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2019Reply of petitioners I.B. and Jane Doe filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: I.B. and Jane Doe
Attorneys for Respondents
Raymond M. Deeny
    Counsel of Record
Sherman & Howard L.L.C.
90 S CASCADE AVE STE 1500
COLORADO SPRINGS, CO 80903-1639

rdeeny@shermanhoward.com
719-475-2440
Party name: April Woodard, et al.
Other
Debo P. Adegbile
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Hale Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Debo.Adegbile@wilmerhale.com
212-295-6717
Party name: Scholars of the Law of Qualified Immunity
James R. Mason III
    Counsel of Record
Home School Legal Defense Asso
One Patrick Henry Circle
Purcellville, VA 20132

jim@hslda.org
5403385600
Party name: HOME SCHOOL LEGAL DEFENSE ASSOCIATION AND PARENTAL RIGHTS FOUNDATION
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners Foundation, et al.
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Plano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Kevin T. Snider
    Counsel of Record
Kevin T. Snider, Atty at Law
Pacific Justice Institute
P.O. Box 276600
Sacramento, CA 95827

ksnider@pji.org
916-857-6900
Party name: Pacific Justice Institute
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law