No. 18-1171
Title:Comcast Corporation, Petitioner
v.
National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Docketed:March 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56479)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief of respondents National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Apr 29 2019Reply of petitioner Comcast Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 15 2019Rescheduled.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8257
Party name: Comcast Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Other
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America