No. 18-1170 | |
Title: | Xitronix Corporation, Petitioner v. KLA-Tencor Corporation, dba KLA-Tencor, Incorporated |
Docketed: | March 8, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-50114) |
Decision Date: | February 15, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 08 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2019) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2019. |
Mar 21 2019 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Xitronix Corporation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 10 2019 | Letter of petitioner dated May 10, 2019, received. |
Main Document | |
May 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019. |
May 23 2019 | Letter of petitioner dated May 23, 2019, received. |
Main Document | |
May 24 2019 | Response Requested. (Due June 24, 2019) |
Jun 24 2019 | Brief of respondent KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 10 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Jul 10 2019 | Reply of petitioner Xitronix Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 30 2019 | Rescheduled. |
Sep 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam G. Unikowsky Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Avenue, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 AUnikowsky@jenner.com | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Xitronix Corporation | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Aaron Gabriel Fountain Counsel of Record | DLA Piper LLP (US) 401 Congress Avenue, Ste 2500 Austin, TX 78701 aaron.fountain@us.dlapiper.com | 5124577190 |
Party name: KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc. | ||
James M. Heintz | DLA Piper LLP (US) One Fountain Square 11911 Freedom Drive, Suite 300 Reston, VA 20190-5602 jim.heintz@dlapiper.com | 703.773.4148 |
Party name: KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc. |