No. 18-1166
Title:Colton W. Sievers, Petitioner
v.
Nebraska
Docketed:March 8, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-17-518)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Waiver of Nebraska of right to respond not accepted for filing. (April 02, 2019) (Corrected efiling submitted).
Apr 02 2019Waiver of right of respondent Nebraska to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 18 2019Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2019)
May 17 2019Motion of Nebraska for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Orin S. Kerr
    Counsel of Record
699 Exposition Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90089

orin@orinkerr.com
2023653303
Party name: Colton Sievers
Attorneys for Respondent
Austin Nicholas Relph
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

austin.relph@nebraska.gov
4024711805
Party name: Nebraska