No. 18-1165
Title:Retirement Plans Committee of IBM, et al., Petitioners
v.
Larry W. Jander, et al.
Docketed:March 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3518)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2019.
Apr 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2019Brief of respondents Larry Jander, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2019Reply of petitioners Retirement Plans Committee of IBM, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 01 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 6, 2019.
Jul 11 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Retirement Plans Committee of IBM, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 16 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 6, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 24, 2019.
Aug 06 2019Brief of petitioners Retirement Plans Committee of IBM, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of the United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and The Business Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI—The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of American Benefits Council and ERISA Industry Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Sep 16 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit it electronic.
Sep 24 2019Brief of respondents Larry W. Jander, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 01 2019Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice and Public Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Occupy the SEC filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 24 2019Reply of petitioners Retirement Plans Committee of IBM, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Argued. For petitioners: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Jonathan Y. Ellis, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Samuel Bonderoff, New York, N. Y.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Retirement Plans Committee of IBM, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
    Counsel of Record
Zamansky, LLC
50 Broadway, 32nd Floor
New York, NY 10004

samuel@zamansky.com
2127421414
Party name: Larry W. Jander, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

rhirschhorn@proskauer.com
212-969-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Benefits Council, and ERISA Industry Committee
Brian David Netter
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

bnetter@mayerbrown.com
2022633339
Party name: The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and The Business Roundtable
Todd M. Schneider
    Counsel of Record
Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP
2000 Powell Street
Suite 1400
Emeryville, CA 94608

tschneider@schneiderwallace.com
4154217100
Party name: Law Professors
Scott Burnett Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900
Huntsville, AL 35801

ssmith@bradley.com
256-517-5100
Party name: DRI—THE VOICE OF THE DEFENSE BAR
Akshat Tewary
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Kamlesh Tewary, P.C.
1974 Route 27
Edison, NJ 08817

info@tewary.com
7322870080
Party name: Occupy the SEC
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: American Association for Justice and Public Justice