No. 18-1160
Title:Teck Metals Ltd., fka Teck Cominco Metals, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
The Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35742)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Teck Metals Ltd., formerly known as Teck Cominco Metals, Ltd.
Blanket Consent
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2019The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2019, for all respondents.
Apr 05 2019Brief amicus curiae of Her Majesty the Queen in Right of the Province of British Columbia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Government of Canada filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2019Brief of respondent State of Washington in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2019Brief of respondent The Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: Teck Metals Ltd., formerly known as Teck Cominco Metals, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul J. Dayton
    Counsel of Record
Ogden Murphy Wallace P.L.L.C.
901 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3500
Seattle, WA 98164

pdayton@omwlaw.com
206-447-7000
Party name: The Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: State of Washington
Jay Douglas GeckWashington Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington St. SE
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

jayg@atg.wa.gov
3605862697
Party name: State of Washington
Other
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
3102291030
Party name: HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN RIGHT OF THE PROVINCE OF BRITISH COLUMBIA
Malcolm Seymour III
    Counsel of Record
Garvey Schubert Barer, P.C.
100 Wall Street, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10005

mseymour@gsblaw.com
(212) 965-4533
Party name: The Government of Canada
Ronald Jay Tenpas
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

rtenpas@velaw.com
2026396791
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.