No. 18-1154
Title:Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Jesse Busk, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2019
Linked with 18A766
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5784, 17-5785)
   Decision Date:September 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 1, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2019Application (18A766) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2019 to March 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Application (18A766) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2019.
Mar 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 24 2019Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2019)
May 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2019 to June 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2019.
Jun 07 2019Brief of respondent Jesse Busk in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Reply of petitioners Integrity Staffing Solutions, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
202-373-6283
Party name: Amazon.com, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Russell Thierman
    Counsel of Record
Thierman Buck LLP
7287 Lakeside Drive
Reno, NV 89511

mark@thiermanbuck.com
775-284-1500
Party name: Jesse Busk, et al.
Eric SchnapperUniv. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Jesse Busk
Other
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., The National Association of Manufacturers, and the National Retail Federation