No. 18-1151 | |
Title: | St. Augustine School, et al., Petitioners v. Carolyn Stanford Taylor, in Her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al. |
Docketed: | March 6, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-2333) |
Decision Date: | October 11, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 7, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 06 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to May 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 24, 2019. |
Apr 05 2019 | Brief of respondent Friess Lake School District in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 24 2019 | Brief of respondents Carolyn Stanford Taylor, in her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 07 2019 | Reply of petitioners St. Augustine School, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 12 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Jun 30 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020. |
Jul 02 2020 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Espinoza v. Montana Dept. of Revenue, 591 U. S. ___ (2020). |
Aug 03 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Richard Michael Esenberg Counsel of Record | Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty 330 E. Kilbourn Ave. Ste. 725 Milwaukee, WI 53202 rick@will-law.org | 414-727-9455 |
Party name: St. Augustine School, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Kristin Renee Pierre Counsel of Record | Axley Brynelson, LLP 2 E. Mifflin Street, Suite 200 Madison, WI 53703 kpierre@axley.com | 6082836719 |
Party name: Friess Lake School District | ||
Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse Counsel of Record | Wisconsin Department of Justice 17 West Main Street Madison, WI 53703 vandermeusejl@doj.state.wi.us | 608-266-7741 |
Party name: Carolyn Stanford Taylor, in her Official Capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, et al. |