No. 18-1150
Title:Georgia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Docketed:March 5, 2019
Linked with 18A598
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11589)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018Application (18A598) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Application (18A598) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 4, 2019.
Mar 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2019.
Apr 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Software & Information Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Matthew Bender & Co., Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2019.
May 06 2019Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute, et al. in support of respondent filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases and Digital Accessibility Advocate in support of respondent filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2019Brief of respondent Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2019Brief amici curiae of 119 Law Students, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Reply of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 02 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 23, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 9, 2019.
Aug 23 2019Joint appendix (3 Volumes) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2019Brief amici curiae of American Society For Testing And Materials, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Software & Information Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amici curiae of International Code Council, Inc. and American Gas Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Matthew Bender & Co., Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Copyright Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 2, 2019.
Oct 09 2019Brief of respondent Public.Resource.Org, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 11 2019Brief amici curiae of The R Street Institute, the Wikimedia Foundation, and Public Knowledge filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amici curiae of 36 Computational Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Internet Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of The Center for Democracy and Technology and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Government Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of American Library Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Professor Shyamkrishna Balganesh and Professor Peter S. Menell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of 39 Law Students, 24 Solo and Small-Firm Practitioners of Law, and 38 Legal Educators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of 116 Law Librarians and 5 Law Library Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Corrected Certificate of Word Count with respect to amici brief of Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases filed. (Oct 23, 2019).
Main Document
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press & 25 Media Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Brendan Keefe, in His Official Capacity as Chief Investigative Reporter for 11Alive Atlanta, and WXIA-TV filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Tennessee Coalition for Open Government and Human Rights Defense Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Print Disability Advocates filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Nina Mendelson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019Amicus brief of Caselaw Access Project submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Nov 04 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 08 2019Reply of petitioners State of Georgia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Stephen Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20037

joshjohnson@velaw.com
202-639-6500
Party name: State of Georgia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Christopher Theodore Bavitz
    Counsel of Record
Cyberlaw Clinic, Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts, Ave, Suite WCC 5018
Cambridge, MA 02138

cbavitz@law.harvard.edu
6174965155
Party name: Caselaw Access Project
Marta Francesca Belcher
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray LLP
1900 University Avenue, 6th Floor
East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Marta.Belcher@ropesgray.com
650 617 4005
Party name: The Center for Democracy and Technology and Cato Institute
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Arkansas, et al.
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
1156 15th St. NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press & 25 Media Organizations
Amy Christine Chai
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

achai@nahb.org
2022668232
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Kyle Kenneth Courtney
    Counsel of Record
Harvard University
1 Harvard Yard, Widener G-20
Cambridge, MA 02138

kyle_courtney@harvard.edu
617-495-4089
Party name: 116 Law Librarians and 5 Law Library Organizations
Sarang Vijay Damle
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

sy.damle@lw.com
202-637-3332
Party name: Current and Former Government Officials
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: The R Street Institute, the Wikimedia Foundation, and Public Knowledge
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute, et al.
Joseph Charles Gratz
    Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jgratz@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: Internet Association
James Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

james.hamilton@morganlewis.com
202-739-3000
Party name: International Code Council, Inc.; American Gas Association
Gautam Singh Hans
    Counsel of Record
Vanderbilt University Law School
131 21st Avenue South
Nashville, TN 37203

gautam.hans@vanderbilt.edu
615-343-2213
Party name: Tennessee Coalition for Open Government and Human Rights Defense Center
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Emory Law School
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

paul.koster@emory.edu
4047273957
Party name: Brendan Keefe, in His Official Capacity as Chief Investigative Reporter for 11Alive Atlanta, and WXIA-TV
Michael Alan Livermore
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

mlivermore@virginia.edu
(434) 982-6224
Party name: 36 Computational Law Scholars
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases and Digital Accessibility Advocate
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Next-Generation Legal Research Platforms and Databases
Peter S. Menell
    Counsel of Record
University of California
Univ. of California, Berkeley School of Law
225 Bancroft Way
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
510 642-5489
Party name: Professor Shyamkrishna Balganesh and Professor Peter S. Menell
Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
IP & Technology Law Clinic, USC Gould School of Law
699 Exposition Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 94303

scotus@jef.pe
214-684-4533
Party name: 39 Law Students, 24 Solo and Small-Firm Practitioners of Law, and 38 Legal Educators
Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
IP & Technology Law Clinic, USC Gould School of Law
699 Exposition Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90089-0071

scotus@jef.pe
213-740-7613
Party name: 119 Law Students, 54 Solo and Small-Firm Practitioners of Law, and 21 Legal Educators
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Software & Information Industry Association
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
3127595947
Party name: Matthew Bender & Co., Inc.
Jennifer Marie Urban
    Counsel of Record
Samuelson Law, Technology & Public Policy Clinic,
353 Boalt Hall, University of California, Berkeley, School of Law
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

jurban@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-7338
Party name: American Library Association, et al.
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: American Society For Testing And Materials, et al.
Brian D. Wassom
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross + Judd
45000 River Ridge Drive
Suite 300
Clinton Twp., MI 48038

bwassom@wnj.com
(248) 784-5039
Party name: American Intellectual Property Association
Jessica Paulie Weber
    Counsel of Record
Brown, Goldstein & Levy, LLP
120 E. Baltimore Street, Suite 1700
Baltimore, MD 21202

jweber@browngold.com
4109621030
Party name: Print Disability Advocates
Nancy E. Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Cowan DeBaets Abrahams & Sheppard LLP
41 Madison Avenue, 38th Floor
New York, NY 10010

nwolff@cdas.com
212-974-7474
Party name: The Copyright Alliance
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Law Professors Nina Mendelson, et al.