No. 18-1140
Title:Avco Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Jill Sikkelee, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Sikkelee, Deceased, et al.
Docketed:March 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3006)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent Jill Sikkelee to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Avco Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Mar 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jill Sikkelee
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 21 2019Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2019)
Apr 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2019.
Apr 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Experimental Aircraft Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Garmin International, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Aerospace Industries Association of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Airbus Americas, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of General Aviation Manufacturers Association filed. (To Be Recovered)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2019Brief of respondent Jill Sikkelee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioner Avco Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-679-5257
Party name: Avco Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Jill Sikkelee
Other
Paul Nathan Bowles III
    Counsel of Record
Fitzpatrick & Hunt, Pagano, Aubert LLP
12 E. 49th Street, 31st Floor
New York, NY 10017

paul.bowles@fitzhunt.com
212-937-4033
Party name: Aerospace Industries Association of America, Inc.
Lauren Lacey Haertlein
    Counsel of Record
General Aviation Manufacturers Association
1400 K St NW. Suite 801
Washington, DC 20005

lhaertlein@GAMA.aero
2023931500
Party name: General Aviation Manufacturers Association
Jonathan M. Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
MB Law Group LLP
117 SW Taylor St.
Suite 200
Portland, OR 97204

jhoffman@mblglaw.com
503-914-2015
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. and National Association of Manufacturers
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Garmin International, Inc.
Michael L. Resis
    Counsel of Record
SmithAmundsen LLC
150 North Michigan Avenue
Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60601-6791

mresis@salawus.com
312-894-3200
Party name: Experimental Aircraft Association, Inc.
David Jonathan Weiner
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

david.weiner@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Airbus Americas, Inc.
Robert Latane WiseBowman and Brooke LLP
901 East Byrd Street
Suite 1650
Richmond, VA 23219

rob.wise@bowmanandbrooke.com
804-649-8200
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar