No. 18-1131
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Eric Quinn Franklin
Docketed:February 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30011)
   Decision Date:September 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2019.
Apr 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2019.
May 15 2019Motion for leave to file a brief in opposition under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent.
May 15 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Davina Te-min Chen
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Davina T. Chen
P.O. Box 9176
Glendale, CA 91226

davina@davinachen.com
323.474.6390
Party name: Eric Quinn Frankin