No. 18-113 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jeremiah Rodgers, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 25, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-1050)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to October 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2018.
Aug 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and Florida Center for Capital Representation at Florida International University College of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian William Stull
    Counsel of Record
ACLU Capital Punishment Project
201 W. Main Street
Suite 402
Durham, NC 27701

bstull@aclu.org
9196829469
Party name: Jeremiah Rodgers
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: State of Florida
Other
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

challigan@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3909
Party name: Florida Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and Florida Center for Capital Representation at Florida International University College of Law