No. 18-1116
Title:Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, et al., Petitioners
v.
Christopher M. Sulyma
Docketed:February 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15864)
   Decision Date:November 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2019 to April 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2019.
Mar 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2019Brief of respondent Christopher M. Sulyma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 14 2019Reply of petitioners Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 27 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 21, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Aug 21 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 21 2019Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Brief of petitioners Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 4, 2019.
Oct 21 2019Brief of respondent Christopher M. Sulyma filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 28 2019Amicus brief of The Pension Rights Center not accepted for filing (October 31, 2019). (Corrected brief submitted).
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Pension Rights Center filed (October 29, 2019). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Christopher M. Sulyma
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Dara Swartz Smith
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E St, . NW
Washington, DC 20049

dsmith@aarp.org
12024346280
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Elizabeth Hopkins
    Counsel of Record
Kantor & Kantor, LLP
19839 Nordhoff Street
Northridge, CA 91324

ehopkins@kantorlaw.net
8188862525
Party name: The Pension Rights Center
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers, et al.