No. 18-1109 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Erin McKinney, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:February 26, 2019
Linked with 18A580
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-93-362-AP)
   Decision Date:September 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018Application (18A580) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2019 to February 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Application (18A580) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 21, 2019.
Feb 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2019 to April 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2019.
Mar 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Phillips Black, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Arizona Capital Representation Project and Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2019Brief of respondent State of Arizona in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2019Reply of petitioner James Erin McKinney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jun 18 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State of Arizona.
Blanket Consent
Jun 26 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 14, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 3, 2019.
Jun 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Erin McKinney.
Blanket Consent
Jul 10 2019Joint motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including August 21, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including October 17, 2019.
Aug 21 2019Brief of petitioner James Erin McKinney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Capital Punishment Center of The University of Texas School of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Advocates for Human Rights and The World Coalition Against the Death Penalty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Capital Representation Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 11, 2019.
Sep 24 2019Motion of respondent for a further extension of time to file the brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Sep 26 2019Motion of respondent to further extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019.
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the Supreme Court of Arizona.
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Oct 25 2019Brief of respondent State of Arizona filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Voice for Crime Victims filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Prosecuting Attorneys’ Advisory Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Utah, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2019The record received from the Supreme Court of Arizona the record is complete. A portion of the record is Sealed. (2 Boxes)
Nov 18 2019Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, and for divided argument DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5600
Party name: James Erin McKinney
Attorneys for Respondent
Oramel Horace Skinner
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

o.h.skinner@azag.gov
6025428327
Party name: State of Arizona
Other
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
777 6th St. NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Amy Bergquist
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
330 Second Avenue South
Suite 800
Minneapolis, MN 55401

abergquist@advrights.org
6123413302
Party name: The Advocates for Human Rights and The World Coalition Against the Death Penalty
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Colleen Clase
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Voice for Crime Victims
111 East Taylor Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004

colleen.avcv@gmail.com
480-600-2661
Party name: Arizona Voice for Crime Victims
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields
New Orleans, LA 70117

benc@thejusticecenter.org
504-529-5955
Party name: The Promise of Justice Initiative
David Joseph Euchner
    Counsel of Record
Pima County Public Defender's Office
33 N. Stone Ave.
#2100
Tucson, AZ 85701

david.euchner@pima.gov
5207246800
Party name: The Arizona Capital Representation Project and Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice
John Howard Fleming
    Counsel of Record
Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas
The Grace Building, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10036

johnfleming@eversheds-sutherland.com
(212) 389-5000
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah, et al.
John Robert Mills
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black
1721 Broadway
Suite 201
Oakland, CA 94612

j.mills@phillipsblack.org
888-532-0897
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Sheila Sullivan Polk
    Counsel of Record
Yavapai County Attorney
1951 W. Camelback Road
Suite 202
Phoenix, AZ 85015

sheila.polk@yavapai.us
928-777-7495 602-542-7222
Party name: Arizona Prosecuting Attorneys’ Advisory Council
Natman Schaye
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Capital Representation Project
1201 E. Jefferson St. #5
Phoenix, AZ 85034

natman@azcapitalproject.org
5209070457
Party name: Arizona Capital Representation Project
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Jordan M. Steiker
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Texas School of Law
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

jsteiker@law.utexas.edu
5122321346
Party name: Capital Punishment Center of The University of Texas School of Law