No. 18-1097
Vide 18-1419
Title:SkyWest, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrea Hirst, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3643, 17-3660)
   Decision Date:December 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Letter amending the Corporate Disclosure Statement received by petitioners.
Main Document
Mar 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2019 to April 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2019.
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2019Brief of respondents Andrea Hirst, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Reply of petitioners SkyWest, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: SkyWest, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gregory F. Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Greg Coleman Law PC
800 S. Gay Street
Suite 1100
Knoxville, TN 37929

greg@gregcolemanlaw.com
865-247-0080
Party name: Andrea Hirst, et al.
Other
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
703 838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc.
Robert A. Siegel
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
400 South Hope Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

rsiegel@omm.com
(213) 430-6005
Party name: Airlines For America