No. 18-109
Title:Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Illumina, Inc.
Docketed:July 24, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2388, 2017-1020)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Aug 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2018Brief of respondent Illumina, Inc in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Reply of petitioner Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Glenn Saunders
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thomas.saunders@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Edward R. Reines
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
201 Redwood Shores Parkway
Redwood Shores, CA 94065

edward.reines@weil.com
650-802-3000
Party name: Illumina, Inc
Other
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors
Daniel K. Nazer
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

daniel@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and R Street Institute