No. 18-1086
Title:Lucky Brand Dungarees, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Marcel Fashions Group, Inc.
Docketed:February 21, 2019
Linked with 18A600
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-0361-cv)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 19, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018Application (18A600) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2018 to February 15, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Application (18A600) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 15, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent Marcel Fashions, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 01 2019Response Requested. (Due May 1, 2019)
Apr 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2019 to May 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 31, 2019.
May 31 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
May 31 2019Brief of respondent Marcel Fashion Group, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioners Lucky Brands Dungarees, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2019Motion of Lucky Brands Dungarees, Inc., et al. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Dale M. Cendali
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

dale.cendali@kirkland.com
(212) 446-4800
Party name: Lucky Brands Dungarees, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Olivera Medenica
    Counsel of Record
Dunnington Bartholow & Miller LLP
230 Park Avenue
21st Floor
New York, NY 10169

OMedenica@dunnington.com
212-682-8811
Party name: Marcel Fashions Group, Inc.
Louis R. GigliottiLouis R. Gigliotti, PA
1605 Dewey Street
Hollywood, FL 33020

lgigliotti@bellsouth.net
954-471-4392
Party name: Marcel Fashions, Inc.