No. 18-1078
Title:James Dawson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joshua Brennan
Docketed:February 19, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2210)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 21, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2019Waiver of right of respondent Joshua Brennan to respond filed.
Main Document
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 22 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 15 2019Response Requested. (Due November 14, 2019)
Nov 08 2019Brief of respondent Joshua Brennan in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 11 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 08 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Marcelyn A. Stepanski
    Counsel of Record
Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, P.C.
27555 Executive Drive
Suite 250
Farmington Hills, MI 48331

mstepanski@rsjalaw.com
2484894100
Party name: James Dawson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Tillman J. Breckenridge
    Counsel of Record
Breckenridge PLLC
1325 G. St., NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

tjb@breckenridgepllc.com
2025677733
Party name: Joshua Brennan