No. 18-1061
Title:Karen Graviss, Petitioner
v.
Department of Defense, Domestic Dependent Elementary and Secondary Schools
Docketed:February 13, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-3173)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2019)
AppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Corrected petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (March 15, 2019)
Main Document
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2019 to April 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2019.
Mar 14 2019Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Government Employees filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Brief of respondent Department of Defense, Domestic Dependent Elementary and Secondary Schools in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
Apr 30 2019Reply of petitioner Karen Graviss filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Karen Graviss
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Defense, Domestic Dependent Elementary and Secondary Schools
Other
Scott Burnett Smith
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900
Huntsville, AL 35801

ssmith@bradley.com
256-517-5198
Party name: Law Professors
Benjamin Conrad Block
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

bblock@cov.com
(202) 662-5205
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program and National Organization of Veterans' Advocates, Inc.
William Henry Burgess IV
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20004

wburgess@kirkland.com
202-389-5957
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Andres Myles Grajales
    Counsel of Record
American Federation of Government Employees, Office of the General Counsel
80 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

grajaa@afge.org
2026396426
Party name: American Federation of Government Employees