No. 18-106
Title:John R. Turner, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 24, 2018
Linked with 17A1297
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-6060)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 18 2018Application (17A1297) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 21, 2018 to July 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
May 22 2018Application (17A1297) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 23, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, John Turner.
Blanket Consent
Aug 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Aug 21 2018Brief amici curiae of C. Ferguson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Judges and Prosecutors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Amicus brief of National Association for Public Defense not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission-August 29, 2018)
Aug 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Center on Wrongful Convictions and Legal Aid Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Public Defense filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Amicus brief of National Association for Public Defense not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission-August 29, 2018)
Aug 23 2018Brief amici curiae of The Due Process Institute and the Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 24, 2018.
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 23, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Louis Hutton
    Counsel of Record
Glankler Brown PLLC
6000 Poplar Avenue
Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38119

rhutton@glankler.com
9015761714
Party name: John Turner
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Former Judges and Prosecutors
Adam Lamparello
    Counsel of Record
National Assn. for Public Defense, Univ. of Cincinnati College of Law
2540 Clifton Ave.
Cincinnati, OH 45219

adamlamparello@yahoo.com
201-317-5115
Party name: National Association for Public Defense
Stephen A. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Cozen O'Connor
1650 Market Street
Suite 2800
Philadelphia, PA 19103

samiller@cozen.com
215-665-4736
Party name: The Due Process Institute and the Cato Institute
Steven J. Mulroy
    Counsel of Record
Cecil C. Humphreys School of Law - University of Memphis
One North Front Street
Memphis, TN 38103

smulroy@memphis.edu
901-678-4494
Party name: Center on Wrongful Convictions and Legal Aid Society
Jon Ashley York
    Counsel of Record
Pentecost, Glenn, Mauldin & York, PLLC
106 Stonebridge Blvd.
Jackson, TN 38305

jyork@pgandr.com
731-668-5995
Party name: C. Ferguson, et al.