No. 18-1059
Title:Bridget Anne Kelly, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 13, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1818)
   Decision Date:November 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2019 to April 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2019.
Mar 15 2019Brief of respondent William Baroni in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Lord Conrad Black and Former Governor Robert F. McDonnell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2019.
May 15 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 23 2019Letter of May 23, 2019 from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
May 28 2019Reply of petitioner Bridget Anne Kelly filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 17, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Brief of petitioner Bridget Anne Kelly filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief of respondent William Baroni, Jr. in support of petitioner filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 17 2019Joint appendix filed (2 volumes). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Michael Binday filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 14, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Bridget Anne Kelly
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael Alexander Levy
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

mlevy@sidley.com
212-839-7341
Party name: William Baroni
Christopher EglesonSidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

cegleson@sidley.com
2138968106
Party name: William Baroni
Other
Joshua Lewis Dratel
    Counsel of Record
Dratel & Lewis
29 Broadway
Suite 1412
New York, NY 10006

jdratel@joshuadratel.com
2127320707
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
David William Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
The Norton Law Firm
299 Third Street, Suite 106
Oakland, CA 94607

dshapiro@nortonlaw.com
5109064906
Party name: MICHAEL BINDAY
Ryan Joseph Walsh
    Counsel of Record
Eimer Stahl LLP
224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100
Chicago, IL 60604

rwalsh@eimerstahl.com
3126607600
Party name: Lord Conrad Black and Former Governor Robert F. McDonnell