No. 18-1052
Title:Zenaido Renteria, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 11, 2019
Linked with 18A562
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2079)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2018Application (18A562) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2018 to February 8, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 29 2018Application (18A562) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 8, 2019.
Feb 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2019 to April 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2019.
Apr 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2019.
May 13 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Zenaido Renteria, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States