No. 18-1049
Title:Peter M. Hoffman, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 11, 2019
Linked with 18A638
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-30104, 16-30226, 16-30013, 16-30527)
   Decision Date:August 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2018Application (18A638) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2019 to February 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Application (18A638) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 7, 2019.
Feb 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Peter M. Hoffman, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2019 to April 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2019.
Mar 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Retired Federal Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
Apr 30 2019Reply of petitioners Peter M. Hoffman, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@omm.com
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Peter M. Hoffman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Christopher Egleson
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

cegleson@sidley.com
(213) 896-6108
Party name: Retired Federal Judges
Timothy Patrick O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
202-626-5552
Party name: Criminal Law Professors
Amy Mason Saharia
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

asaharia@wc.com
202-434-5847
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers