No. 18-1048
Title:GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp., fka Converteam SAS, Petitioner
v.
Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al.
Docketed:February 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10944)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Waiver of right of respondents Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC
Blanket Consent
Mar 13 2019Waiver of right of respondents Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 28 2019Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2019)
Apr 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2019 to May 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended for all respondents to and including May 21, 2019.
May 21 2019Brief of Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 30, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
May 21 2019Brief of respondents Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.(5/30/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioner GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 17 2019Letter re Briefing Schedule of GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
205-251-3000
Party name: Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC
Don Ray Sampen
    Counsel of Record
Clausen Miller, P.C.
10 S. LaSalle St., 16th Fl.
Chicago, IL 60603

dsampen@clausen.com
312-606-7803
Party name: Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America, et al.
Other
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers