No. 18-1023
Vide 18-1028, 18-1038
Title:Maine Community Health Options, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2395)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Maine Community Health Options
Blanket Consent
Feb 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2019 to April 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2019.
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Economists filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Blue Cross Blue Shield Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019.
May 08 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2019Reply of petitioner Maine Community Health Options filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in No. 18-1028 and No. 18-1038 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jun 24 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1023. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1023. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” (July 17, 2019)
Jun 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Maine Community Health Options
Blanket Consent
Jul 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Moda Health Plan, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jul 17 2019Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jul 17 2019Joint motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 30, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 21, 2019. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Moda Health Plan, Inc.
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Land of Lincoln Mutual Health Insurance Compan, and Illinois Nonprofit Insurance Corporation
Stephen John McBrady
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20004

smcbrady@crowell.com
202-624-2500
Party name: Maine Community Health Options
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Frank A. Gumina
    Counsel of Record
WPS Health Solutions
1717 W. Broadway
Madison, WI 53713

Frank.Gumina@wpsic.com
6089777526
Party name: Wisconsin Physicians Service Insurance Corporation; WPS Health Plan, Inc.
K. Lee Blalack II
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

lblalack@omm.com
202-383-5374
Party name: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association
Andrew H. Schapiro
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60606

andrewschapiro@quinnemanuel.com
312-705-7400
Party name: Economists M. Kate Bundorf; Scott Harrington; Michael Chernew; Leemore S. Dafny; Thomas G. McGuire; Mark V. Pauly; Kosali Simon