No. 18-1019
Title:Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
Docketed:February 4, 2019
Linked with 18A686
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1883)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2018Application (18A686) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2019 to February 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Application (18A686) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 4, 2019.
Feb 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2019 to April 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 5, 2019.
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Focus on the Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Operation Outcry, Women Injured by Abortion, The Justice Foundation, Melinda Thybault filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pro Life Action League filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Trinity Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Brief of respondent Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Reply of petitioners Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth J. Falk
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of Indiana
1031 E. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46202

kfalk@aclu-in.org
317-635-4059
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
2101 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 525
Arlington, VA 22201

Steven.Aden@aul.org
202-741-4917
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists et al.
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Pro Life Action League
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
University of St. Thomas School of Law
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana, et al.
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
11120 Wurzbach, Suite 206
San Antonio, TX 78230

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-274-5274
Party name: Trinity Legal Center
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 1313
Ojai, CA 93024-1313

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 337-6880
Party name: Operation Outcry, Women Injured by Abortion, The Justice Foundation, Melinda Thybault
Kevin Hayden Theriot
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

ktheriot@ADFlegal.org
4802500932
Party name: Focus on the Family