No. 18-1015
Vide 18-776
Title:Ruben Ovalles, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:February 5, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-60438)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2019)
Jan 29 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Feb 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2019 to April 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2019.
Mar 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019.
May 08 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
May 23 2019Reply of petitioner Ruben Ovalles filed.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-776 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jun 24 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-776. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-776. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Ruben Ovalles
Mark Andrew PradaPrada Urizar, PLLC
3191 Coral Way, Suite 607
Miami, FL 33145

mprada@pradaurizar.com
786.238.2222
Party name: Ruben Ovalles
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Whitaker, Acting Att'y Gen.