No. 18-1010
Title:Joseph P. Hagan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Karim Khoja
Docketed:February 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56069)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2019 to April 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 5, 2019.
Apr 05 2019Brief of respondent Karim Khoja in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 09 2019Rescheduled.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John C. Dwyer
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

dwyerjc@cooley.com
650-843-5000
Party name: Joseph P. Hagan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Ramzi Abadou
    Counsel of Record
Kahn Swick & Foti, LLP
912 Cole Street, 251
San Francisco, CA 94117

Ramzi.Abadou@ksfcounsel.com
(504) 455-1400
Party name: Karim Khoja
Ramzi AbadouKahn Swick & Foti
912 Cole Street, #251
San Francisco, CA 94117

ramzi.abadou@ksfcounsel.com
504-455-1400
Party name: Karim Khoja