No. 17A745 | |
Title: | Robert A. Rucho, et al., Applicants v. Common Cause, et al. |
Docketed: | January 12, 2018 |
Linked with 17-1295 | |
Lower Ct: | United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina |
Case Numbers: | (1:16-CV-1026 1:16-CV-1164) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 12 2018 | Application (17A745) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jan 12 2018 | Response to application (17A745) requested by The Chief Justice, due Wednesday, January 17, by noon ET. |
Jan 16 2018 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III. |
Main Document | |
Jan 16 2018 | Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by George Holding, et al. |
Main Document | |
Jan 17 2018 | Response to application from respondents Common Cause, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 17 2018 | Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 17 2018 | Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Louisiana, et al. |
Main Document | |
Jan 18 2018 | Reply of applicants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Jan 18 2018 | Application (17A745) referred to the Court. |
Jan 18 2018 | Application (17A745) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, case Nos. 1:16-CV-1026 and 1:16-CV-1164, entered January 9, 2018, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application for stay. |
Jan 23 2018 | Motion to construe the application for a stay as a jurisdictional statement and for expedited briefing and oral argument schedule filed by appellees Common Cause, et al. and League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 06 2018 | The motion of appellees to construe the application for a stay as a jurisdictional statement and for an expedited briefing and oral argument schedule is denied. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would grant the motion. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Paul D. Clement Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 655 Fifteenth Street, NW Washington, DC 20005 paul.clement@kirkland.com | 2028795000 |
Party name: Robert A. Rucho, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Emmet J Bondurant II Counsel of Record | Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP 3900 One Atlantic Center 1201 W. Peachtree Street Atlanta, GA 30309 bondurant@bmelaw.com | 404-421-0837 |
Party name: Common Cause, et al. | ||
Paul March Smith Counsel of Record | Campaign Legal Center 1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400 Washington, DC 20005 psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org | 202-736-2200 |
Party name: League of Women Voters of North Carolina et al. | ||
Other | ||
Elizabeth Baker Murrill Counsel of Record | Office of the Louisiana Attorney General P.O. Box 94005 Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005 murrille@ag.louisiana.gov | 225-326-6766 |
Party name: THE STATES OF LOUISIANA, TEXAS, MICHIGAN, AND SOUTH CAROLINA | ||
Jason Brett Torchinsky Counsel of Record | Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC 45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100 Warrenton, VA 20186 jt@hvjt.law | 540 341 8808 |
Party name: Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III | ||
Thomas John Josefiak Counsel of Record | Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC 45 North Hill Drive Suite 100 Warrenton, VA 20186 tomj@hvjt.law | (540) 341-8808 |
Party name: George Holding, Walter B. Jones, Jr., Virginia Foxx, Mark Walker, David Rouzer, Richard Hudson, Robert Pittenger, Patrick T. McHenry, Mark Meadows, and Ted Budd | ||
Scott Eric Gessler Counsel of Record | Klenda Gessler & Blue LLC 1624 Market Street Suite 202 Denver, CO 80202 sgessler@klendagesslerblue.com | 720-432-5705 |
Party name: American Civil Rights Union |