No. 17-991
Title:Paysun Long, Petitioner
Randy Pfister, Warden
Docketed:January 18, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-3327)
   Decision Date:October 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Randy Pfister, in his official capacity as Warden of Stateville Correctional Center to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 12 2018Response Requested. (Due March 14, 2018)
Mar 14 2018Brief of respondent Randy Pfister, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

Attorneys for Petitioner
Douglas G. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
300 North LaSalle
Chicago, IL 60654
Party name: Paysun Long
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Marc Glick
    Counsel of Record
Illinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601
Party name: Randy Pfister, Warden