No. 17-99 | |
Title: | Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority - East, et al., Petitioners v. Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, L.L.C., et al. |
Docketed: | July 19, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-30162) |
Decision Date: | March 3, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 12, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2017) |
Jul 28 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Hilliard Oil and Gas, Inc. to respond filed. |
Aug 10 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 18, 2017, for all respondents. |
Aug 18 2017 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors. |
Aug 22 2017 | Brief of respondents Chevron U.S.A., Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 29 2017 | Reply of petitioners Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority-East, et al. filed. |
Oct 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. |
Oct 30 2017 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion and this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
James A. Feldman Counsel of Record | 5335 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20015 wexfeld@gmail.com | 202-730-1267 |
Party name: Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority-East, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Ashley C. Parrish Counsel of Record | King & Spalding LLP 1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW Washington, DC 20006 aparrish@kslaw.com | (202)-737-0500 |
Party name: Chevron U.S.A., Inc., et al. | ||
Carl David Rosenblum Counsel of Record | Jones Walker, LLP 201 St. Charles Avenue New Orleans, LA 70170-0000 | 504-582-8296 |
Party name: Hilliard Oil and Gas, Inc. | ||
Other | ||
Joshua Simon Force Counsel of Record | Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, L.L.C. 909 Poydras Street, 28th Floor New Orleans, LA 70112 jforce@shergarner.com | 504-299-2100 |
Party name: Law Professors |