No. 17-986
Title:IQ Products Company, Petitioner
v.
WD-40 Company
Docketed:January 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20595)
   Decision Date:September 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 07 2018Response Requested. (Due April 6, 2018)
Mar 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2018 to May 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2018.
May 04 2018Brief of respondent WD-40 Company in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas A. Gravante Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
575 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

ngravante@bsfllp.com
212 446-2300
Party name: IQ Products Company
Attorneys for Respondent
David J. Noonan
    Counsel of Record
Noonan Lance Boyer & Banach, L.L.P.
701 Island Avenue, Suite 400
San Diego, CA 92101

dnoonan@noonanlance.com
619-780-0880
Party name: WD-40 Company