No. 17-982
Title:John Teixeira, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alameda County, California, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-17132)
   Decision Date:October 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2018 to April 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 10, 2018.
Feb 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Brief of respondents Alameda County, California, et al., in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: John Teixeira, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Philip Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

brian.goldman@orrick.com
4157735676
Party name: Alameda County, California, et al.,
Other
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
303 279-6536
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Craig Allen Livingston
    Counsel of Record
Linvingston Law Firm, P.C.
1600 South Main Street
Suite 280
Walnut Creek, CA 94596

clivingston@livingstonlawyers.com
(925) 952-9880
Party name: The National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.