No. 17-976
Title:CTIA - The Wireless Association, Petitioner
v.
City of Berkeley, California, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15141)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, CTIA - The Wireless Association.
Blanket Consent
Jan 18 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, City of Berkeley, et al..
Blanket Consent
Jan 19 2018Waiver of right of respondent City of Berkeley to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 30 2018Response Requested. (Due March 1, 2018)
Jan 30 2018Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, Competitive Enterprise Institute, and Cause of Action Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association of National Advertisers, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2018 to March 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 2, 2018.
Feb 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice and National Federation of Independent Business filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief of respondents City of Berkeley, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 17 2018Reply of petitioner CTIA - The Wireless Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of National Institute of Family and Life Advocates v. Becerra, 585 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Lawrence Lessig
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1563 Massachusetts Ave
Cambridge, MA 02138

lessig@law.harvard.edu
6174968853
Party name: City of Berkeley, et al.
Other
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbrown@wileyrein.com
2027197579
Party name: The Cato Institute, Competitive Enterprise Institute, and Cause of Action Institute
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4000
Party name: Association of National Advertisers, Inc.
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.834.3322
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
3000 K Street, N.W.
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Justin Marc Pearson
    Counsel of Record
lnstitute for Justice
2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3180
Miami, FL 33131

JPearson@IJ.org
(305) 721-1600
Party name: Institute for Justice and National Federation of Independent Business
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

aunikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al.