No. 17-975
Title:Total Gas & Power North America, Incorporated, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2018
Linked with 17A477
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20642)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2017Application (17A477) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2017 to January 5, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Oct 30 2017Application (17A477) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 6, 2017.
Nov 22 2017Application (17A477) to extend further the time from December 6, 2017 to January 5, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 22 2017Application (17A477) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 5, 2018.
Jan 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2018 to March 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2018 to April 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 11, 2018.
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2018 to May 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 11, 2018.
May 11 2018Brief of respondents Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 11 2018Brief of Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 11, 2018)
May 14 2018Brief of Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al. in opposition submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 25 2018Reply of petitioners Total Gas & Power North America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: TOTAL Gas & Power North America, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.