No. 17-972
Title:Michael Nordyke, Petitioner
v.
Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Docketed:January 9, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3682)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2018Brief of respondent Howmedica Osteonics Corp. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jed L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.
325 Columbia Turnpike, 3d Fl.
Florham Park, NJ 07932

jmarcus@bressler.com
973 966-9678
Party name: Michael Nordyke
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Dale Wexler
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw
233 S. Wacker Drive
Suite 8000
Chicago, IL 60606

mwexler@seyfarth.com
312-460-5559
Party name: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.