No. 17-965
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Hawaii, et al.
Docketed:January 5, 2018
Linked with 17A550, 17A824
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17168)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2017Application (17A550) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 21 2017Response to application due on or before 12 p.m., Tuesday, November 28, 2017.
Nov 22 2017Motion (17A550) for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by the State of Texas, et al.
Main DocumentOther
Nov 28 2017Response to application from respondents Hawaii, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 28 2017Motion (17A550) for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by the State of New York, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2017Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Dec 04 2017Application (17A550) referred to the Court.
Dec 04 2017Application (17A550) granted by the Court. The application for a stay presented to Justice Kennedy and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the District Court’s October 20, 2017 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is sought. If a writ of certiorari is sought and the Court denies the petition, this order shall terminate automatically. If the Court grants the petition for a writ of certiorari, this order shall terminate when the Court enters its judgment. In light of its decision to consider the case on an expedited basis, we expect that the Court of Appeals will render its decision with appropriate dispatch. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.
Jan 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2018)
PetitionProof of Service
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 12 2018Brief of respondents State of Hawaii, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jan 16 2018Reply of petitioner Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 19 2018Petition GRANTED. In addition to the questions presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue Question 3 presented by the brief in opposition.
Jan 25 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2018Application (17A824) for leave to file the brief of petitioners, brief of respondents, and the reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 08 2018Application (17A824) granted by Justice Kennedy for leave to file the brief of petitioners, brief of respondents, and the reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits.
Feb 21 2018Brief of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Great Lakes Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 25, 2018.
Feb 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society and National Association of Evangelicals in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Liberty, Life, and Law Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amici curiae of National Security Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Letter of respondents State of Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Zionist Organization of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Mormon History and Law in Support of Neither Party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in Support of Neither Party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondents State of Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Khizr Khan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of William Webster, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Immigration Equality and Others In Support of Respondents filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed. (Corrected brief to be submitted and filed).
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Brief amici curiae of 36 Appellate Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Branch Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges and Others filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Motion of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party for enlargement of time for oral argument and for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of American Counsel on Education and 32 Other Higher Education Associations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center and The American Immigration Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Labor Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Civil Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Muslim Justice League, Muslim Public Affairs Council, Islamic Circle of North America Council for Social Justice, MPower Change, Justice for Muslims Collective, and Partnership for Advancement of New Americans filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Retired Generals and Admirals of the U.S. Armed Forces filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by David Boyle. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs, T'Ruah, Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, and Women of Reform Judaism filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Karen Korematsu, Jay Hirabayashi, Holly Yasui, The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Civil Rights Organizations, and National Bar Associations of Color filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Plaintiffs in Iranian Alliances Across Borders v. Trump filed. (Distibuted)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Pars Equality Center, Iranian American Bar Association, and Public Affairs Alliance of Iranian Americans, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, Constitutional Law, and Immigration Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of States of New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington, and the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Tahirih Justice Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Jewish Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Colleges and Universities filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Evan McMullin, Anne Applebaum, Max Boot, Linda Chavez, Eliot Cohen, Mindy Finn, Juleanna Glover, Norman Ornstein, Michael Steele, Charlie Sykes, and Jerry Taylor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of U.S. Companies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of City of Chicago et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of The Association of Art Museum Directors, The American Alliance of Museums, The Association of Academic Museums and Galleries, The College Art Association of America, 112 Art Museums filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Janet A. Napolitano, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of New York University filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association and Others filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Immigration, Family, and Constitutional Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Eblal Zakzok, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Scholars on the Text and Structure of the Immigration, and Nationality Act filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Certain Immigrant Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Muslim Lawyers and Other Muslim Bar Associations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Mickey Edwards and Einer R. Elhauge filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Episcopal Bishops filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Freedom From Religion Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Immigration Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of PEN America, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Japanese American Citizens League filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations filed (corrected filing). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Amicus brief of Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations submitted.
Apr 02 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of one document that is SEALED and electronic.
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars in Support of Respondents filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Motion of Former National Security Officials for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (April 04, 2018)
Apr 13 2018Motion of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Apr 18 2018Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 23 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by David Boyle GRANTED.
Apr 25 2018Argued. For petitioners: Noel J. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C.
May 01 2018Letter of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 01 2018Letter from amici curiae Pars Equality Center, et al., filed. (Distributed).
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: State of Hawaii
Other
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Robert Alan Atkins
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

ratkins@paulweiss.com
212-373-3183
Party name: Eblal Zakzok et al.
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: National League of Cities, et al.
Hilarie Bass
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60610

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5109
Party name: American Bar Association
John Bellinger Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: Evan McMullin, Anne Applebaum, Max Boot, Linda Chavez, Eliot Cohen, Mindy Finn, Juleanna Glover, Norman Ornstein, Michael Steele, Charlie Sykes, and Jerry Taylor
Lynne Bernabei
    Counsel of Record
Bernabei & Kabat, PLLC
1400 - 16th Street, N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036-2223

bernabei@bernabeipllc.com
202-745-1942
Party name: Civil Rights Organizations
Elizabeth Ann Berney
    Counsel of Record
ZOA
633 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017

lizberney@gmail.com
212-481-1500
Party name: Zionist Organization of America
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernstein@willkie.com
202-303-1108
Party name: William Webster, John Danforth, Peter Keisler, Carter Phillips, Brackett Denniston, Michael Castle, Ray LaHood, Connie Morella, Christopher Shays, Christine Todd Whitman, Stanley Twardy, and Richard Bernstein
Charles Albert Bird
    Counsel of Record
4182 Ingalls Street
San Diego, CA 92103

charles.bird@dentons.com
6196992406
Party name: 36 Appellate Lawyers
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@arnoldporter.com
202-679-5257
Party name: Pars Equality Center, Iranian American Bar Association, and Public Affairs Alliance of Iranian Americans, Inc.
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734) 904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Barbara Jane Chisholm
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon LLP
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

bchisholm@altber.com
4154217151
Party name: Labor Organizations
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, Inc.
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, National Association of Evangelicals
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: PEN America, et al.
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, NE
Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

dcortman@adflegal.org
7703390774
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
Duke School of Law
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27707-0000

wdellinger@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Japanese American Citizens League
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
9103264554
Party name: Liberty, Life, and Law Foundation
Tadhg Aodh Joseph Dooley
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin and Dana LLP
One Century Tower, P.O. Box 1832
New Haven, CT 06508

tdooley@wiggin.com
203-498-4549
Party name: Mickey Edwards and Einer R. Elhauge
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Chapman University Fowler School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Michael Jacob Ewart
    Counsel of Record
Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson P.S.
999 Third Avenue, Suite 4600
Seattle, WA 98104

jake.ewart@hcmp.com
2066231745
Party name: Episcopal Bishops
Meir Feder
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey St.
New York, NY 10281

mfeder@jonesday.com
2123263939
Party name: Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, Constitutional Law, and Immigration Law
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

chad.golder@mto.com
(202) 220-1103
Party name: American Counsel on Education and 32 Other Higher Education Associations
Eric James Gorman
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
155 North Wacker Drive
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60606

eric.gorman@skadden.com
(312) 407-0700
Party name: Immigration Equality, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Michael Julian Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
5301 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mgottlieb@bsfllp.com
2022379617
Party name: JANET A. NAPOLITANO et al.
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
John Barney Harris
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
488 Madison Avenue
10th Floor
New York, NY 10022

jharris@fkks.com
2129800120
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, Jewish Council for Public Affairs, T'Ruah, Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, and Women of Reform Judaism
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Colleges and Universities
Christopher Escobedo Hart
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210

chart@foleyhoag.com
617 832 1232
Party name: Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc.
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
312-853-2936
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center and The American Immigration Lawyers Association
Daniel Erin Jackson
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

djackson@keker.com
4153915400
Party name: Khizr Khan
Omar Cassim Jadwat
    Counsel of Record
ACLU Foundation
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ojadwat@aclu.org
2125492620
Party name: International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Roberta A Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan & Company, LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

rkaplan@kaplanandcompany.com
2127630883
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars in Support of Respondents
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
202-466-3234
Party name: Plaintiffs in Iranian Alliances Across Borders v. Trump
Sharon Katz
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

sharon.katz@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: The Association of Art Museum Directors, The American Alliance of Museums, The Association of Academic Museums and Galleries, The College Art Association of America, 112 Art Museums
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
James Wayne Kim
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jakim@mwe.com
2027568386
Party name: National Asian Pacific American Bar Association and Others
Kenneth Alan Klukowski
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Rights Union
3213 Duke Street #625
Alexandria, VA 22314

kklukowski@theacru.org
8777302278
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
Harold Hongju Koh
    Counsel of Record
Rule of Law Clinic, Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@ylsclinics.org
2034641801
Party name: Former National Security Officials
David Yury Livshiz
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer, US, LLP
601 Lexington Avenue, 31stFloor
New York, NY 10022

david.livshiz@freshfields.com
212-277-4000
Party name: The Cato Institute
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: Former Executive Branch Officials
Adam S. Lurie
    Counsel of Record
Linklaters, LLP
601 13th St., Suite 400 South
Washington, DC 20005

adam.lurie@linklaters.com
2026549227
Party name: American Jewish Committee
Adeel Abdullah Mangi
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

aamangi@pbwt.com
(212) 36-2000
Party name: National Association of Muslim Lawyers and Other Muslim Bar Associations
Rebecca Susan Markert
    Counsel of Record
FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION
P.O. Box 750
Madison, WI 53701

rmarkert@ffrf.org
(608) 256-8900
Party name: FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION
Fatma Essam Marouf
    Counsel of Record
Texas A&M University School of Law, Immigrant Rights Clinic
307 W. 7th St. Suite LL50
Fort Worth, TX 76102

fatma.marouf@law.tamu.edu
310-431-6693
Party name: Immigration Law Scholars
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: Scholars of Mormon History and Law
Carl Jonas Micarelli
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

cmicarelli@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: Retired Generals and Admirals of the U.S. Armed Forces
Steven E. Obus
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
11 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

oalladi@proskauer.com
212.969.3000
Party name: NEW YORK UNIVERSITY
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: U.S. Companies
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Joshua David Rogaczewski
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 N. Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jrogaczewski@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges and Others
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212)-937-7294
Party name: Scholars of Immigration Law
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(757)226-2749
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Karen Korematsu, Jay Hirabayashi, Holly Yasui, The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Civil Rights Organizations, and National Bar Associations of Color
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA 90064

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: Muslim Justice League, Muslim Public Affairs Council, Islamic Circle of North America Council for Social Justice, MPower Change, Justice for Muslims Collective, and Partnership for Advancement of New Americans
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
30 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 800
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312.744.7764
Party name: City of Chicago et al.
Ilya Somin
    Counsel of Record
Professor of Law, George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Arlington, VA 22201

isomin@gmu.edu
7039938069
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Alan Craig Turner
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

aturner@stblaw.com
212-455-2000
Party name: CERTAIN IMMIGRANT RIGHTS ORGANIZATIONS
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway
New York, NY 10271-0332

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington, and the District of Columbia
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
GREAT LAKES JUSTICE CENTER
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
(517) 322-3207
Party name: Great Lakes Justice Center
Scott Lewis Winkelman
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

swinkelman@crowell.com
2026242500
Party name: Tahirih Justice Center et al.
Robert Andrew Wiygul
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rwiygul@hangley.com
2154967042
Party name: Immigration, Family, and Constitutional Law Professors
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis, LLP
1919 M Street, NW, Fl. 8
Washignton, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
2023331325
Party name: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
David Eliezer Yerushalmi
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of David Yerushalmi, P.C.
2020 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 189
Washington, DC 20006

dyerushalmi@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
6462620500
Party name: National Security Experts
Bruce V. SpivaPerkins Coie LLP
700 13th St NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

bspiva@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6203
Party name: International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations