No. 17-9572 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Curtis Giovanni Flowers, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1205
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2010-DP-01348-SCT)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2018Application (17A1205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2018 to July 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 02 2018Application (17A1205) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 22, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Magnolia Bar Association, Mississippi Center for Justice, and Innocence Project New Orleans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 27, 2018 to September 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 26, 2018.
Sep 27 2018Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Reply of petitioner Curtis Flowers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 02 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the Mississippi Supreme Court erred in how it applied Batson v. Kentucky, 476 U. S. 79 (1986), in this case.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sheri Lynn Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School
245 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

slj8@cornell.edu
607 255 6478
Party name: Curtis Flowers
Attorneys for Respondent
Brad Alan Smith
    Counsel of Record
The Office of the Mississippi Attorney General
P. O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

bsmit@ago.state.ms.us
769-220-2009
Party name: Mississippi
Other
James William Craig
    Counsel of Record
The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
4400 S. Carrollton Ave.
New Orleans, LA 70119

jim.craig@macarthurjustice.org
504-620-2259
Party name: Magnolia Bar Association, Mississippi Center for Justice, and Innocence Project New Orleans