No. 17-9560
Title:Hamid Mohamed Ahmed Ali Rehaif, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15860-AA)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jul 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 24 2018Response Requested. (Due August 23, 2018)
Aug 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 24, 2018.
Oct 24 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 07 2018Reply of petitioner Hamid Rehaif filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Jan 31 2019Letter informing Clerk of joint briefing schedule agreed upon by parties. Petitioner will file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits on or before February 22, 2019. Respondent will file respondent's brief on the merits on or before Monday, March 25, 2019.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Hamid Rehaif.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 23, 2019
Feb 22 2019Brief of petitioner Hamid Rehaif filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Hamid Rehaif.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Mar 25 2019Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 28 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Apr 01 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Everytown for Gun Safety filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Reply of petitioner Hamid Rehaif filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Godfrey
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
201 South Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

robert_godfrey@fd.org
407-648-6338
Party name: Hamid Rehaif
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Thomas W. Hillier II
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Ave.
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

THillier@perkinscoie.com
206-359-6328
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Charles G. Roth
    Counsel of Record
National Immigration Justice Center
208 LaSalle St., Ste. 1300
Chicago, IL 60604

croth@heartlandalliance.org
3126601613
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center
Eric Anders Tirschwell
    Counsel of Record
Everytown Law
450 LEXINGTON AVE, #4184
New York, NY 10017

etirschwell@everytown.org
646-324-8222
Party name: Everytown for Gun Safety