No. 17-952
Title:Wyoming, Petitioner
v.
Phillip Sam
Docketed:January 4, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wyoming
   Case Numbers:(S-16-0168)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2018 to March 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2018.
Feb 02 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Utah et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2018 to April 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 6, 2018.
Apr 06 2018Brief of respondent Phillip Sam in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter K. Michael
    Counsel of Record
Wyoming Attorney General's Office
Office of the Attorney General, 2320 Capitol Avenue
Cheyenne, WY 82002

peter.michael@wyo.gov
307-777-7841
Party name: State of Wyoming
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Phillip Sam
Other
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
8015389600
Party name: State of Utah et al.